U.S. Federal Court Records for the Southern District of Florida

florida Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Southern District of Florida
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-15027-
  • Case Name: M.I.S. Commodities, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kiem, Tarek Kirk [Use Cash Collateral]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kiem, Tarek Kirk [Notice of Hearing (BK)]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kiem, Tarek Kirk [Case Management Summary]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kiem, Tarek Kirk [Employ]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kiem, Tarek Kirk [Tax Return Documents]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kiem, Tarek Kirk [Chapter 11 Small Business - All Financial Documents]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kiem, Tarek Kirk [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kiem, Tarek Kirk [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kiem, Tarek Kirk [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kiem, Tarek Kirk [Order Setting Subchapter V Status Conference]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kiem, Tarek Kirk [Meeting of Creditors 11]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kiem, Tarek Kirk [Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency [ECF]]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kiem, Tarek Kirk [UST Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kiem, Tarek Kirk [Order Authorizing Debtor in Possession to Continue Operation of its Business]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kiem, Tarek Kirk [Notice of Deficiency]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kiem, Tarek Kirk [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kiem, Tarek Kirk [Voluntary Petition Ch 11 [ECF]]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kiem, Tarek Kirk [Corporate Ownership Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.