U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Florida

florida Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Florida
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:25-bk-02918-
  • Case Name: Carla Ballesteros Laney
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Carapella, Dawn A [Request for Notice]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Carapella, Dawn A [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Carapella, Dawn A [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Carapella, Dawn A [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Carapella, Dawn A [Pro Bono Representation of Debtor]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Carapella, Dawn A [(NO PAPER) - 521 Compliance Entry]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Carapella, Dawn A [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Carapella, Dawn A [AJTA - Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case No Proof of Claim Deadline]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Carapella, Dawn A [ADI - Spread Text]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Carapella, Dawn A [Tax Documents]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Carapella, Dawn A [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Carapella, Dawn A [Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Carapella, Dawn A [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Carapella, Dawn A [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.