U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Florida

florida Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Florida
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:25-ap-00181-
  • Case Name: MP Octopus Pizza LLC et al v. McComas
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: ap Office: 8 Chapter: [Proof of Service (BK)]
  • May 13, 2025: ap Office: 8 Chapter: [Order Scheduling (Including AP/BK Trial Matters)]
  • May 12, 2025: ap Office: 8 Chapter: [CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held]
  • May 08, 2025: ap Office: 8 Chapter: [Response]
  • May 06, 2025: ap Office: 8 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • May 06, 2025: ap Office: 8 Chapter: [Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only]
  • May 06, 2025: ap Office: 8 Chapter: [ADI - Summons Issued (auto)]
  • May 05, 2025: ap Office: 8 Chapter: [Certificate of Necessity (AP)]
  • May 05, 2025: ap Office: 8 Chapter: [Motion for Preliminary Injunction (AP)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.