U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Florida

florida Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Florida
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:25-bk-02915-
  • Case Name: FAMILY INTERNATIONAL HOME BUILDERS, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice (BK)]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Hearing / Status Conference / Reaffirmation Hearing]
  • May 11, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic)]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Case Management Summary]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [341 Mtg. Notice - Ch 11 Corp w/Claim Deadline]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Deficient Filing (BK)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [ADI - Notice to Debtor(s) Attorney Regarding Local Rule 2081-1 (Paperless Entry)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Order Authorizing DIP to Operate Business]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Corporate Ownership]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.