U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Florida

florida Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Florida
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40201
  • Case Name: Earnestine Barnes Clark
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Request for Notices (Not Attorney Appearance)]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Notice of Pro Bono & Bankruptcy Resources (PDF/Form)]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Order Establishing Duties of the Debtor (Ch 13) (Form)]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Order re Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments (PDF / Form)]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [5Alpha Case Admin Assignment (NoDoc)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Notice of 341(a) Meeting and Initial Confirmation Hearing - Ch 13]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Documents Provided to Debtor or Non-Electronic Filer (PDF/Form/Paperless)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Documents Provided to Debtor or Non-Electronic Filer (PDF/Form/Paperless)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Notice to Cure Petition Deficiencies (Form/PDF)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Notice to Cure Petition Deficiencies (Form/PDF)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Application for Individuals to Pay the Filing Fee in Installments (Form B 103A)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Application for Individuals to Pay the Filing Fee in Installments (Form B 103A)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Statement of Social Security Numbers/SSN (Restricted Access)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Social Security Numbers/SSN (Restricted Access)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.