U.S. Federal Court Records for the Southern District of Florida

florida Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Southern District of Florida
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-01127-
  • Case Name: Crespo v. Bank of America, N.A.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: ap Office: 0 Chapter: [Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding]
  • May 08, 2025: ap Office: 0 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • May 07, 2025: ap Office: 0 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 06, 2025: ap Office: 0 Chapter: [Notice of Appearance and Request for Service]
  • May 05, 2025: ap Office: 0 Chapter: [Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020]]
  • May 05, 2025: ap Office: 0 Chapter: [Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020]]
  • May 05, 2025: ap Office: 0 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.