U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Florida

florida Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Florida
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-bk-02691-
  • Case Name: Robert Michael Bello and Cathy Ruth Bello
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Chambers, Gene T [Request for Notice]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Chambers, Gene T [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Chambers, Gene T [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Chambers, Gene T [(NO PAPER) - 521 Compliance Entry]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Chambers, Gene T [Proof of Service (BK)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Chambers, Gene T [AJTA - Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case No Proof of Claim Deadline]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Chambers, Gene T [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Chambers, Gene T [Prior Bankruptcy Case(s)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Chambers, Gene T [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Chambers, Gene T [Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Chambers, Gene T [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Chambers, Gene T [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.