U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Florida

florida Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Florida
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-bk-01482-
  • Case Name: Anthony Williams
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Request for Notice]
  • May 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Notice of Deficient Filing (BK)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [(NO PAPER) - 521 Compliance Entry]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [AJTA - Chapter 13 Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Notice of Deficient Filing (BK)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Prior Bankruptcy Case(s)]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [ADI - Administrative Order FLMB-2018-2 Prescribing Procedures for Chapter 13 Cases]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.