open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Hawaii

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Hawaii
    Case Number:19-00181
    Party Name:Russell Davidson Orrick and Alison Apostadiro Orrick
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Withdrawal of Motion, Objection, or Other Document (Text Entry - No PDF)]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Schedules A-J (Amended)]
    Date Published:April 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Request for Valuation of Secured Claim (CM27)]
    Date Published:March 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [4 Certificate of Service - Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Request for Notice]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Request for Notice - No PDF (batch)]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.hib.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?91392
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =