Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Hawaii

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Hawaii
    Case Number:19-00313
    Party Name:David Evans Tiqui, Sr.
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Request for Valuation of Secured Claim (CM27)]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Schedules A-J (Amended)]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:May 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Schedules A-J (Initial Filing)]
    Date Published:April 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [BNC Order to Show Cause Regarding Payment of Filing Fee [CHIEF DEPUTY]]
    Date Published:April 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Documents]
    Date Published:March 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Extend Time to File Case Opening Documents (Motion)]
    Date Published:March 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments and Order]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [2 Ch 13 Voluntary Petition]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.hib.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?91527
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =