Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Hawaii

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Hawaii
    Case Number:19-00318
    Party Name:Julio Gasmen Dauz and Lilibeth Enriquez Dauz
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A. [Order on Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A. [Reaffirmation Agreement (NEW EVENT - USE FOR ALL REAFFIRMATION AGREEMENTS)]
    Date Published:May 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A. [Certification/Certificate of Debtor Education (Form 423 or actual certificate)]
    Date Published:April 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A. [Request for Notice - No PDF (batch)]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A. [Request for Notice]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.hib.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?91533
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =