open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Hawaii

HAWAII PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Hawaii
    Case Number:19-01159
    Party Name:David Byun Eagar
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Relief from Automatic Stay AND Ch 13 Codebtor Stay (Motion) (FEE 181)]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Order Confirming Ch 13 Plan]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [4 Certificate of Service - Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Extend Automatic Stay]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Declaration and Request for Entry of Order]
    Date Published:September 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Extend Automatic Stay (Motion)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.hib.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?92392
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =