open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Hawaii

HAWAII PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Hawaii
    Case Number:19-01469
    Party Name:Agnes Urian Ramirez
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Order Confirming Ch 13 Plan]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Withdrawal of Motion, Objection, or Other Document (Text Entry - No PDF)]
    Date Published:January 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:January 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [4 Certificate of Service - Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.hib.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?92723
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =