open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Hawaii

HAWAII PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Hawaii
    Case Number:19-01470
    Party Name:Rodrigo Ordonez Castro
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Yanagi, Richard A. [Relief from Automatic Stay]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Yanagi, Richard A. [Order Discharging Chapter 13 Trustee (Converted or Transferred Case) [C/A]]
    Date Published:January 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Yanagi, Richard A. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:December 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Yanagi, Richard A. [Convert Ch 13 Case to Ch 7 (Debtor's Motion or Notice)]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Yanagi, Richard A. [Convert Ch 13 Case to Ch 7 - Debtor's Motion or Notice (FEE 25)]
    Date Published:December 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Convert Ch 13 Case to Ch 7 - Debtor's Motion or Notice (FEE 25)]
    Date Published:December 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Yanagi, Richard A. [Schedules A-J (Initial Filing)]
    Date Published:December 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Schedules A-J (Initial Filing)]
    Date Published:December 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Documents]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Extend Time to File Case Opening Documents (Motion)]
    Date Published:November 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:November 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Relief from Automatic Stay (Motion) (FEE 181)]
    Date Published:November 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.hib.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?92724
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =