open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Hawaii

HAWAII PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Hawaii
    Case Number:20-00941
    Party Name:Frontier Co., Ltd.
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Approve]
    Date Published:September 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Order (Generic)]
    Date Published:September 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [miscellaneous document]
    Date Published:September 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Declaration and Request for Entry of Order]
    Date Published:September 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Granting Motion to Shorten Time]
    Date Published:August 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Shorten Time (Motion)]
    Date Published:August 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Approve (Motion)]
    Date Published:August 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:August 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Petition for Recognition of Foreign Proceeding]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.hib.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?93880
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =