U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Hawaii

hawaii Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Hawaii
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-90033
  • Case Name: United States Department of the Army v. The Minesen Company
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 01, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
January, 2021
  • January 13, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • January 06, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 05, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 04, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 04, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Intervene (Motion)]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 23, 2020: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Preliminary Injunction (Application)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.