U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Hawaii

hawaii Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Hawaii
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 21-00010
  • Case Name: Terry Lee Pruitt
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Dane S. [Compensation - REPORTABLE]
  • July 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Dane S. [Declaration and Request for Entry of Order]
  • July 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Dane S. [Ch 7 Final Report and Fee Application - ORDER]
June, 2022
  • June 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Dane S. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Dane S. [Final Report: Notice of Final Report]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Dane S. [Final Report: Trustee's Final Application for Compensation]
  • May 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Dane S. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Dane S. [Application for Compensation / Expenses]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Dane S. [Report of Sale]
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Dane S. [Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens Under Section 363(f)]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Dane S. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Dane S. [Granting Application to Employ Professional (General)]
  • February 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Dane S. [Employ (Application)]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Dane S. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Dane S. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Dane S. [Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens Under Section 363(f) (Motion) (FEE 188)]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Dane S. [Stipulated Order]
March, 2021
  • March 15, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Dane S. [Granting Application to Employ Professional (Real Estate)]
  • March 15, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Dane S. [Employ (Application)]
  • March 04, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Dane S. [Granting Application to Employ Professional (General)]
  • March 03, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Dane S. [Employ (Application)]
February, 2021
  • February 05, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Dane S. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Dane S. [Request for Notice]
  • January 07, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Dane S. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • January 07, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Dane S. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.