U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Hawaii

hawaii Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Hawaii
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 21-00014
  • Case Name: Kristin Rochelle Flores and Richard Flores, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Order Discharging Chapter 13 Trustee (Converted or Transferred Case) [C/A]]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Declaration re: Electronic Filing]
  • October 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Errata]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Schedules A-J (Amended)]
  • September 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Convert Ch 13 Case to Ch 7 (Debtor's Motion or Notice)]
  • September 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Convert Ch 13 Case to Ch 7 - Debtor's Motion or Notice (FEE 25)]
  • September 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Convert Ch 13 Case to Ch 7 - Debtor's Motion or Notice (FEE 25)]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 15, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Order Confirming Ch 13 Plan]
January, 2021
  • January 12, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [4 Certificate of Service - Chapter 13 Plan]
  • January 11, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Granting Motion to Redact]
  • January 11, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 11, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Redact (Motion) (FEE 26)]
  • January 11, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Withdrawal of Motion, Objection, or Other Document (Text Entry - No PDF)]
  • January 11, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • January 11, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.