U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Hawaii

hawaii Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Hawaii
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 21-00044
  • Case Name: Cesar Renol Caba
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Order Dismissing Case w/ 180-Day Bar]
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 03, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 03, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Dismiss Case (Motion)]
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Withdrawal of Motion, Objection, or Other Document (Text Entry - No PDF)]
  • April 08, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Service]
March, 2021
  • March 15, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Request for Notice - No PDF (batch)]
  • March 12, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certification/Certificate of Debtor Education (Form 423 or actual certificate)]
February, 2021
  • February 01, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Schedules A-J (Initial Filing)]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • January 19, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [2 Ch 13 Voluntary Petition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.