U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Hawaii

hawaii Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Hawaii
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 21-00084
  • Case Name: Raymond Anibal Dilliner and Shasta Brandy Dilliner
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Order Confirming Ch 13 Plan]
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Compensation - REPORTABLE]
  • August 13, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Declaration and Request for Entry of Order]
  • August 13, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Order Discharging Chapter 7 Trustee (Converted, Transferred Case, Successor Trustee - NDR) [C/A]]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Request for Notice]
  • July 13, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 12, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Schedules A-J (Amended)]
  • July 12, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Convert Ch 7 Case to Ch 13 Case (Debtor's Motion)]
  • July 01, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Application for Compensation / Expenses]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Convert Ch 7 Case to Ch 13 Case (Debtor's Motion)]
  • June 07, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Granting Application to Employ Professional (General)]
  • June 07, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Employ (Application)]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Certification/Certificate of Debtor Education (Form 423 or actual certificate)]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
January, 2021
  • January 30, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Request for Notice]
  • January 29, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [BNC Order to File Documents and Notice of Intent to Dismiss [Intake or C/A]]
  • January 29, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Debtor Electronic Noticing]
  • January 29, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [1 Ch 7 Voluntary Petition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.