U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Hawaii

hawaii Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Hawaii
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 21-00111
  • Case Name: Dablene Uilani Michi Dutro
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certificate of Service]
  • January 24, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Memorandum]
  • January 18, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certificate of Service]
  • January 18, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Declaration]
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certificate of Service]
  • January 10, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certificate of Service]
  • January 10, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Memorandum]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certificate of Service]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Withdrawal of Motion, Objection, or Other Document (Text Entry - No PDF)]
  • November 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Declaration Re Plan Payments, Tax Returns and Tax Refunds]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Ch 13 - Motion to Dismiss Case (batch)]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certificate of Service]
  • July 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certificate of Service]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Relief from Automatic Stay (Motion) (FEE 188)]
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Order Confirming Ch 13 Plan]
April, 2021
  • April 06, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 06, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Objection to Claim]
  • April 06, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Withdrawal of Motion, Objection, or Other Document (Text Entry - No PDF)]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 22, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Service]
February, 2021
  • February 03, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 03, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • February 03, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.