U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Hawaii

hawaii Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Hawaii
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 21-00121
  • Case Name: Starlyn Pamela Mikami
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [BNC Order Granting Application for Unclaimed Funds]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Application for Payment of Unclaimed Funds]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Final Report: Notice of Deposit of Unclaimed Funds]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [1 Transcript]
  • September 23, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Transcript Request]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Order Dismissing Case (Sua Sponte)]
  • August 13, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Relief from Automatic Stay]
  • August 11, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [z Order]
  • August 11, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Approve Sale]
  • August 11, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Employ]
  • August 11, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [BNC Order Denying Confirmation of Ch 13 Plan [CHAMBERS ONLY]]
  • August 03, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certificate of Service]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 27, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 21, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 20, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 20, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Declaration]
  • July 20, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Memorandum]
  • July 20, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Relief from Automatic Stay (Motion) (FEE 188)]
  • July 14, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 14, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [motion]
  • July 09, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 09, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Approve Sale (Motion)]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Employ (Application)]
  • June 28, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Schedules A-J (Amended)]
  • June 28, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Strike (Motion)]
  • June 28, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Service]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Service]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 19, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Service]
March, 2021
  • March 08, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Request for Notice]
  • March 01, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 01, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Schedules A-J (Initial Filing)]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Documents]
  • February 22, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Extend Time to File Case Opening Documents (Motion)]
  • February 08, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • February 08, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.