U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Hawaii

hawaii Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Hawaii
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 21-00215
  • Case Name: Efren Aguinaldo and Sheila Aguinaldo
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Approve Loan Modification]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certificate of Service]
  • November 18, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Approve Loan Modification (Motion)]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Order Confirming Ch 13 Plan]
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Order Discharging Chapter 7 Trustee (Converted, Transferred Case, Successor Trustee - NDR) [C/A]]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 26, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Schedules A-J (Amended)]
  • July 12, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Convert Ch 7 Case to Ch 13 Case (Debtor's Motion)]
  • July 06, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Objection to Debtor's Exemptions]
  • July 02, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Declaration and Request for Entry of Order]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Convert Ch 7 Case to Ch 13 Case (Debtor's Motion)]
  • June 16, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Schedules A-J (Amended)]
  • June 09, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Certificate of Service]
  • June 09, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Objection to Debtor's Exemptions]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Approving Stipulation to Extend Deadline(s) to File Complaint / 707(b) Motion]
  • May 28, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Granting Application to Employ Professional (General)]
  • May 28, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Employ (Application)]
  • May 24, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Certification/Certificate of Debtor Education (Form 423 or actual certificate)]
  • May 19, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Master Service List]
  • May 19, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • May 19, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Statement of Intention [Official Form B108]]
  • May 19, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • May 19, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Statement of Current Monthly Income (Ch 7) and Means Test Calculation (Form 122A-1)]
  • May 19, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Schedules A-J (Amended)]
  • May 19, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Amended Voluntary Petition]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Certification/Certificate of Debtor Education (Form 423 or actual certificate)]
  • March 15, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 08, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [1 Ch 7 Voluntary Petition]
  • March 08, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [BNC Order to File Documents and Notice of Intent to Dismiss [Intake or C/A]]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.