U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Hawaii

hawaii Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Hawaii
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 21-00212
  • Case Name: Joby C.K. Celoza
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Ch 7 Final Report and Fee Application - ORDER]
  • March 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Certificate of Service]
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Final Report: Notice of Final Report]
  • February 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Final Report: Trustee's Final Application for Compensation]
March, 2021
  • March 08, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 08, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.