U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Hawaii

hawaii Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Hawaii
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 21-00259
  • Case Name: Patricia Irene Bell
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case (batch)]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certificate of Service]
  • March 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Modify Confirmed Plan (Motion)]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Order Confirming Ch 13 Plan]
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Withdrawal of Motion, Objection, or Other Document (Text Entry - No PDF)]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • February 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certificate of Service]
  • February 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Request for Valuation of Secured Claim (CM27)]
  • December 15, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Request for Valuation of Secured Claim (CM27)]
July, 2021
  • July 09, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • July 07, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Errata]
  • July 07, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Service]
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 02, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Request for Valuation of Secured Claim (CM27)]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [BNC Order Denying Confirmation of Ch 13 Plan [CHAMBERS ONLY]]
  • May 19, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • May 19, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Service]
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • April 07, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Declaration and Request for Entry of Order]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 24, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 23, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Extend Automatic Stay (Motion)]
  • March 22, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [4 Certificate of Service - Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 19, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 18, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Request for Valuation of Secured Claim (CM27)]
  • March 18, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 18, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.