U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Hawaii

hawaii Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Hawaii
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 21-00269
  • Case Name: Dorian Sing Humes and Francise Sau Jang Humes
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 03, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Order Confirming Ch 13 Plan]
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Request for Valuation of Secured Claim (CM27)]
  • May 07, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Service]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 23, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Request for Valuation of Secured Claim (CM27)]
  • March 22, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 22, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 22, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.