U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Hawaii

hawaii Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Hawaii
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 21-00295
  • Case Name: Chris Lopp Rose
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case (batch)]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Relief from Automatic Stay]
  • July 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Withdraw as Counsel]
  • July 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Declaration and Request for Entry of Order]
  • July 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Ch 13 - Motion to Dismiss Case (batch)]
  • July 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certificate of Service]
  • July 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Declaration]
  • July 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Withdraw As Counsel (Motion)]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certificate of Service]
  • January 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Affidavit]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certificate of Service]
  • October 06, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Declaration]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certificate of Service]
  • September 30, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Affidavit]
  • September 30, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Declaration]
  • September 30, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Memorandum]
  • September 14, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certificate of Service]
  • September 14, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Relief from Automatic Stay (Motion) (FEE 188)]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Order Confirming Ch 13 Plan]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 19, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Schedules A-J (Amended)]
  • April 05, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Request for Notice]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [4 Certificate of Service - Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 26, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 26, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.