U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Hawaii

hawaii Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Hawaii
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 21-00495
  • Case Name: Paul Allen Garcia
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case (batch)]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Relief from Automatic Stay and Codebtor Stay]
  • June 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Declaration]
  • June 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certificate of Service]
  • June 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Declaration]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Ch 13 - Motion to Dismiss Case (batch)]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Order Confirming Ch 13 Plan]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Withdrawal of Motion, Objection, or Other Document (Text Entry - No PDF)]
  • July 12, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 09, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • July 06, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Declaration]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 10, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 10, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Declaration]
  • June 10, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Relief from Automatic Stay AND Ch 13 Codebtor Stay (Motion) (FEE 188)]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Request for Notice]
  • May 26, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 17, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [4 Certificate of Service - Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 14, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Request for Valuation of Secured Claim (CM27)]
  • May 13, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • May 13, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.