U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Hawaii

hawaii Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Hawaii
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 21-00494
  • Case Name: Kenneth Larry Suazo, Jr. and Joseph David Chiarello
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Dane S. [Order Discharging Chapter 13 Trustee (Converted or Transferred Case) [C/A]]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Dane S. [Schedules A-J (Amended)]
  • May 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Dane S. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • May 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Dane S. [Convert Ch 13 Case to Ch 7 (Debtor's Motion or Notice)]
  • May 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Dane S. [Convert Ch 13 Case to Ch 7 - Debtor's Motion or Notice (FEE 25)]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Ch 13 - Motion to Dismiss Case (batch)]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Order Confirming Ch 13 Plan]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 18, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Schedules A-J (Initial Filing)]
  • May 14, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Request for Notice]
  • May 13, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 13, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.