U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Hawaii

hawaii Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Hawaii
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 21-00496
  • Case Name: Samson Manicad Rafanan and Kristy Regpala Rafanan
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 06, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [DSO Certification]
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Withdrawal of Motion, Objection, or Other Document (Text Entry - No PDF)]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Incur Debt]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certificate of Service]
  • January 10, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Reconsider (Motion)]
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Schedules A-J (Amended)]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certificate of Service]
  • December 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certificate of Service]
  • December 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Granting Motion to Shorten Time]
  • December 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Shorten Time (Motion)]
  • December 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Incur Debt (Motion)]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Order Confirming Ch 13 Plan]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certificate of Service]
  • September 30, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [4 Certificate of Service - Chapter 13 Plan]
  • September 27, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Schedules A-J (Amended)]
August, 2021
  • August 29, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [BNC Order Denying Confirmation of Ch 13 Plan [CHAMBERS ONLY]]
  • August 17, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certificate of Service]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Service]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [4 Certificate of Service - Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 17, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [4 Certificate of Service - Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 14, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Request for Valuation of Secured Claim (CM27)]
  • May 14, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Request for Notice]
  • May 14, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 14, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.