U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Hawaii

hawaii Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Hawaii
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 21-00512
  • Case Name: Charles K Mamala, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Modify Confirmed Plan (Order)]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certificate of Service]
  • February 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Modify Confirmed Plan (Motion)]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Request for Notice]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Order Confirming Ch 13 Plan]
  • August 20, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Withdrawal of Motion, Objection, or Other Document (Text Entry - No PDF)]
  • August 18, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certificate of Service]
  • August 18, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Text Order (Special)]
  • July 12, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Order Confirming Ch 13 Plan]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Request for Notice]
  • May 19, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 19, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.