U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Hawaii

hawaii Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Hawaii
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 21-00511
  • Case Name: Raymond Falefitu Masoe and Reyna Kealaonapua Masoe
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Yanagi, Richard A. [Order Discharging Chapter 13 Trustee (Converted or Transferred Case) [C/A]]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Yanagi, Richard A. [Order on Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • August 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Yanagi, Richard A. [Reaffirmation Agreement (USE FOR ALL REAFFIRMATION AGREEMENTS)]
  • August 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Yanagi, Richard A. [Schedules A-J (Amended)]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Yanagi, Richard A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • July 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Yanagi, Richard A. [Statement of Current Monthly Income (Ch 7) and Means Test Calculation (Form 122A-1)]
  • July 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Yanagi, Richard A. [Statement of Intention [Official Form B108]]
  • July 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Yanagi, Richard A. [Schedules A-J (Amended)]
  • July 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Yanagi, Richard A. [Convert Ch 13 Case to Ch 7 (Debtor's Motion or Notice)]
  • July 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Yanagi, Richard A. [Convert Ch 13 Case to Ch 7 - Debtor's Motion or Notice (FEE 25)]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Order Confirming Ch 13 Plan]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 19, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 19, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.