U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Hawaii

hawaii Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Hawaii
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 10-02647
  • Case Name: Wallace Danly Aweau and Darlene Frances Aweau
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Farmer, David C. [Avoid Lien]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Farmer, David C. [Certificate of Service]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Farmer, David C. [Certificate of Service]
June, 2021
  • June 01, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Farmer, David C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Farmer, David C. [Granting Motion to Reopen Case]
  • May 20, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Farmer, David C. [Avoid Lien (Motion) - For Ch 7 Cases Only]
  • May 20, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Farmer, David C. [Reopen Ch 7 Case (Motion) (FEE 260)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.