U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Hawaii

hawaii Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Hawaii
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 21-00514
  • Case Name: Enrique Ramos Geronimo
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Yanagi, Richard A. [Order (Generic)]
  • September 15, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Yanagi, Richard A. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 15, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Yanagi, Richard A. [Declaration and Request for Entry of Order]
August, 2021
  • August 02, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Yanagi, Richard A. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 02, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Yanagi, Richard A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (Motion) (FEE 188)]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Yanagi, Richard A. [Stipulated Order]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Yanagi, Richard A. [Request for Notice]
  • May 20, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Yanagi, Richard A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • May 20, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Yanagi, Richard A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.