U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Hawaii

hawaii Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Hawaii
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00020
  • Case Name: Robson Saimon
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certificate of Service]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Determine Mortgage Fees and Expenses re: Rule 3002.1 (Motion)]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Order Confirming Ch 13 Plan]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certificate of Service]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Request for Notice]
  • January 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Schedules A-J (Initial Filing)]
  • January 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • January 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.