U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Hawaii

hawaii Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Hawaii
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00270
  • Case Name: Minerva A Ilagan
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Extend Time to File Documents]
  • June 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Creditor List (Amended - FEE 32)]
  • June 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Extend Time to File Case Opening Documents (Motion)]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Documents]
  • May 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Creditor List (Amended - FEE 32)]
  • May 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Extend Time to File Case Opening Documents (Motion)]
  • May 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Request for Notice]
  • May 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Documents]
  • May 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Extend Time to File Case Opening Documents (Motion)]
  • May 03, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Documents]
  • May 03, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Extend Time to File Case Opening Documents (Motion)]
  • May 03, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 03, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certification/Certificate of Debtor Education (Form 423 or actual certificate)]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [2 Ch 13 Voluntary Petition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.