U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Hawaii

hawaii Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Hawaii
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00377
  • Case Name: Deanna Kayihilani Moisa and Michael Anthony Moisa
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Order Confirming Ch 13 Plan]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [4 Certificate of Service - Chapter 13 Plan]
  • July 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certificate of Service]
  • July 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Schedules A-J (Amended)]
  • July 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certification/Certificate of Debtor Education (Form 423 or actual certificate)]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [4 Certificate of Service - Chapter 13 Plan]
  • June 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Request for Notice]
  • June 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.