U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Hawaii

hawaii Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Hawaii
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00382
  • Case Name: Wayne S. Saito
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • November 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certificate of Service]
  • November 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certificate of Service]
  • November 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certificate of Service]
  • November 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Declaration]
  • November 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Memorandum]
  • November 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Relief from Automatic Stay AND Ch 13 Codebtor Stay (Motion) (FEE 188)]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certificate of Service]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • August 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • August 03, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certificate of Service]
  • August 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certificate of Service]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Schedules A-J (Amended)]
  • July 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • July 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certificate of Service]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Request for Notice]
  • June 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certificate of Service]
  • June 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Request for Notice]
  • June 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Granting Motion to Shorten Time]
  • June 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Shorten Time (Motion)]
  • June 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Extend Automatic Stay (Motion)]
  • June 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certificate of Service]
  • June 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.