U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Hawaii

hawaii Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Hawaii
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00415
  • Case Name: Marcus Paul Taoy, Jr. and Jasmine KP Parish-Taoy
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Withdrawal of Motion, Objection, or Other Document (Text Entry - No PDF)]
  • November 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Declaration re: Electronic Filing]
  • November 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Certificate of Service]
  • November 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Schedules A-J (Amended)]
  • November 03, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Certificate of Service]
  • November 03, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Objection to Debtor's Exemptions]
  • November 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Granting Application to Employ Professional (General)]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Employ (Application)]
  • October 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Request for Notice - No PDF (batch)]
  • October 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Certificate of Service]
  • October 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Declaration re: Electronic Filing]
  • October 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Schedules A-J (Amended)]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Certificate of Service]
  • September 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Declaration re: Electronic Filing]
  • September 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Schedules A-J (Amended)]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Certificate of Service]
  • August 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Schedules A-J (Amended)]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.