U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Hawaii

hawaii Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Hawaii
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00433
  • Case Name: Arlene Velarde Cajulao
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Order Confirming Ch 13 Plan]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certificate of Service]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [BNC Order Denying Confirmation of Ch 13 Plan [CHAMBERS ONLY]]
  • August 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • August 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certificate of Service]
  • August 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certificate of Service]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • July 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certificate of Service]
  • July 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Schedules A-J (Initial Filing)]
  • July 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Request for Notice]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certificate of Service]
  • June 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Granting Motion to Shorten Time]
  • June 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Shorten Time (Motion)]
  • June 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Extend Automatic Stay (Motion)]
  • June 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.