U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Hawaii

hawaii Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Hawaii
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00133
  • Case Name: Dean Wesley Powell
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certificate of Service]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Text Order (Special)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Request to Avoid Lien (CM07)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Request for Valuation of Secured Claim (CM27)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Schedules A-J (Initial Filing)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Reconsider Order Dismissing Case (Motion)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Order Dismissing Case (Sua Sponte)]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Text Order (Special)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Extend Time to File Case Opening Documents (Motion)]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Documents]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Extend Time to File Case Opening Documents (Motion)]
February, 2025
  • February 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments and Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.