U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Hawaii

hawaii Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Hawaii
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00286
  • Case Name: Valentino Oscar Quijano
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Documents]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Extend Time to File Case Opening Documents (Motion)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Declaration and Request for Entry of Order]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certificate of Service]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Extend Automatic Stay (Motion)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Declaration re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.