U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:13-cv-00064
  • Case Name: Rocky Mountain Medical Management, LLC et al v. LHP Hospital Group, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2015
  • October 26, 2015: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 26, 2015: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • October 13, 2015: [Order]
July, 2015
  • July 24, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • July 24, 2015: [Corrective Entry]
  • July 24, 2015: [Sealed Reply to Response to Motion]
June, 2015
  • June 15, 2015: [Order]
  • June 15, 2015: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2015
  • February 18, 2015: [Stipulation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.