U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00053
  • Case Name: Martin v. City of Nampa et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 13, 2017: [Judgment]
  • November 13, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • November 13, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
October, 2017
  • October 19, 2017: [Lodged Document (Unsealed)]
July, 2017
  • July 05, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2017
  • May 19, 2017: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • May 19, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • May 19, 2017: [Seal]
  • May 19, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2017
  • April 05, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Discovery]
  • April 05, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2017
  • March 09, 2017: [Declaration]
  • March 07, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • January 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Trial]
  • January 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 06, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • December 15, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 05, 2016: [Trial]
September, 2016
  • September 06, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
August, 2016
  • August 18, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 16, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • August 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
July, 2016
  • July 30, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 25, 2016: [Judgment]
  • July 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • July 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
June, 2016
  • June 02, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 12, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 11, 2016: [Seal Document]
  • April 11, 2016: [Sealed Response to Motion]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 22, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 16, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • March 16, 2016: [File Excess Pages]
  • March 16, 2016: [Seal Document]
  • March 16, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Protective Order]
  • November 24, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • November 03, 2015: [Notice of Change of Address]
July, 2015
  • July 21, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 17, 2015: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • July 17, 2015: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • July 02, 2015: [Consent Filed]
June, 2015
  • June 17, 2015: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 17, 2015: [Scheduling Conference]
  • June 16, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2015
  • February 19, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.