U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00049
  • Case Name: Stewart v. Terry et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2015
  • November 09, 2015: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • November 06, 2015: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
July, 2015
  • July 24, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 09, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 07, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 07, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 06, 2015: [Response to Motion]
February, 2015
  • February 20, 2015: [Corrective Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.