U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00054
  • Case Name: In Re: Leonard Otto Wallace
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • January 04, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
  • January 04, 2018: [USCA Order]
May, 2017
  • May 11, 2017: [USCA Memorandum]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Return Mail]
  • July 20, 2016: [Judgment]
  • July 20, 2016: [Order]
June, 2016
  • June 13, 2016: [USCA Order]
December, 2015
  • December 08, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
November, 2015
  • November 16, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
October, 2015
  • October 16, 2015: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • October 16, 2015: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 14, 2015: [Notice of Appeal]
  • October 14, 2015: [Receipt]
  • October 13, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
September, 2015
  • September 21, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 21, 2015: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • September 21, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
February, 2015
  • February 20, 2015: [Notice of Filing BK Appeal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.