U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00051
  • Case Name: Brummett v. Blades
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Judgment]
  • November 29, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
August, 2016
  • August 10, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 08, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 01, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 01, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Order]
  • July 26, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 26, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 22, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 12, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 27, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • June 17, 2016: [Letter]
  • June 03, 2016: [Supplement]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 23, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 19, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Order]
  • April 29, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2016
  • February 04, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
January, 2016
  • January 12, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
December, 2015
  • December 15, 2015: [Letter]
  • December 08, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • December 07, 2015: [Response to Motion]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 24, 2015: [Hearing]
  • November 24, 2015: [Traverse]
  • November 10, 2015: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 10, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 10, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
September, 2015
  • September 08, 2015: [Response to Motion]
August, 2015
  • August 25, 2015: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 19, 2015: [Lodged Document (Unsealed)]
  • August 17, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 17, 2015: [Response to Habeas Petition]
July, 2015
  • July 30, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
February, 2015
  • February 20, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.