U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00055
  • Case Name: Douglas v. Zions Bank N.A. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 07, 2016: [Judgment]
  • March 04, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
February, 2016
  • February 16, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 02, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 02, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 19, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2015
  • December 08, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • December 08, 2015: [Appear]
  • December 01, 2015: [Notice of Change of Address]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Status Report]
  • November 17, 2015: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
February, 2015
  • February 20, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.