U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00056
  • Case Name: Amanatullah v. The United States Life Insurance Company of the City of New York et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Court's Certificate of Service]
  • February 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • February 21, 2020: [Hearing]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • November 09, 2017: [Order]
  • November 09, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 19, 2017: [Order]
  • October 19, 2017: [USCA Order]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 28, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 25, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 24, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2017
  • July 11, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • July 06, 2017: [Attorney Fees]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
May, 2017
  • May 11, 2017: [Stay]
  • May 05, 2017: [Response to Motion]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 24, 2017: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • April 20, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • April 20, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • April 17, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • April 14, 2017: [Intervene]
  • April 14, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 13, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 13, 2017: [Order]
  • April 13, 2017: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 11, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 10, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • April 07, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Judgment on Partial Findings]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Bill of Costs]
  • March 31, 2017: [Attorney Fees]
  • March 24, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • March 24, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • March 24, 2017: [Judgment on Partial Findings]
  • March 24, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 23, 2017: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • March 22, 2017: [Judgment]
February, 2017
  • February 08, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • February 08, 2017: [Order]
  • February 08, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [Order]
  • January 20, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2016
  • October 13, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 13, 2016: [Order]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Supplement]
  • September 20, 2016: [Supplement]
  • September 20, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • September 19, 2016: [Declaration]
  • September 19, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 08, 2016: [Order]
  • September 07, 2016: [Stipulation]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 01, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 01, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 01, 2016: [Relief]
May, 2016
  • May 11, 2016: [Order]
  • May 11, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 06, 2016: [Stipulation]
March, 2016
  • March 10, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 03, 2016: [Stipulation]
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 16, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • January 29, 2016: [Strike]
  • January 29, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 29, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 27, 2016: [File Excess Pages]
  • January 27, 2016: [Order]
  • January 27, 2016: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • January 25, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • January 19, 2016: [Report of Mediation]
  • January 08, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • January 08, 2016: [Strike]
  • January 08, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2015
  • November 06, 2015: [Order]
  • November 06, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 05, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • November 02, 2015: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 30, 2015: [File Excess Pages]
September, 2015
  • September 21, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • September 04, 2015: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • September 04, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
February, 2015
  • February 23, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.