U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00057
  • Case Name: Huntsman v. State of Idaho
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2016
  • October 07, 2016: [Appeal Record Returned]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [USCA Order]
July, 2016
  • July 18, 2016: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
March, 2016
  • March 15, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 15, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Judgment]
  • February 25, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
January, 2016
  • January 07, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 07, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
November, 2015
  • November 18, 2015: [Letter]
September, 2015
  • September 25, 2015: [Response to Motion]
July, 2015
  • July 06, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2015
  • February 24, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.